blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2759386 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201310170827 EP13153110



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103963182Global Dossier 06.08.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13153110 29.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2759386Global Dossier 30.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13153110 29.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN203408935U 29.01.2014U
Priority number Date
EP13153110 29.01.2013