Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759386

EP2759386 - Device and method for cleaning the wire of a wire saw [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2015  [2015/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials Switzerland Sàrl
Route de Genève 42
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Jung Eung
Av. des Figuiers 35
1007 Lausanne / CH
02 / Sueldia, Raphael
Ch. d őmbreual 5
1008 Prilly / CH
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13153110.529.01.2013
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759386
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B28D5/00, H01L21/02, B28D5/04
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Reinigung des Drahts einer Drahtsäge[2014/31]
English:Device and method for cleaning the wire of a wire saw[2014/31]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour nettoyer le fil d'une scie à fil[2014/31]
Examination procedure29.01.2013Examination requested  [2014/31]
31.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/31]
10.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH02152764  (SUMITOMO METAL IND; NIPPON SPINDLE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JP2008213111  (SHARP KK) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0013] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0432288  (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * column 7, lines 46-53 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]JPH0890405  (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]US6390896  (HUBER ANTON [DE] ET AL) [A] 1,10,11 * page 3, lines 7-17 * * figure 1 *