blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2685438

EP2685438 - HOME APPLIANCE AND ITS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeoungdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Ha, Sangdoo
391-2 Gaeumjung-dong
Changwon-si
641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR
02 / Lee, Jinwook
391-2 Gaeumjung-dong
Changwon-si
641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR
03 / Kim, Moonhyun
391-2 Gaeumjung-dong
Changwon-si
641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR
04 / Kim, Deoghyeon
391-2 Gaeumjung-dong
Changwon-si
641-110 Kyungsangnam-do / KR
 [2014/03]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/30]
Former [2014/03]Greenaway, Martin William, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13153510.631.01.2013
[2014/03]
Priority number, dateKR2012007450009.07.2012         Original published format: KR 20120074500
[2014/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2685438
Date:15.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2685438
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2685438
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2015
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/28, G05B15/02, G05B23/02
[2019/08]
CPC:
G05B15/02 (EP,US); G05B23/00 (BR); H04M11/00 (BR,KR);
G08B21/187 (US); G05B23/0205 (BR,US); G05B23/027 (EP,BR,US);
G06Q30/02 (BR,KR); H04L12/282 (US); H04L12/2825 (EP,US);
H04L12/2834 (EP,US); G06Q50/04 (BR); H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/27]H04L12/28
Former IPC [2014/03]G08B29/02, G05B23/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
Former [2014/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND SYSTEM DAFÜR[2019/11]
English:HOME APPLIANCE AND ITS SYSTEM[2014/03]
French:APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE ET SON SYSTÈME[2019/11]
Former [2014/03]Haushaltsgerät und System dafür
Former [2014/03]Appareil domestique et son système
Examination procedure31.01.2013Examination requested  [2014/03]
04.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2019
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2013
AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CY24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
MK24.07.2019
MT24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
FR31.01.2020
GB31.01.2020
IE31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
LU31.01.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU31.01.2013
AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CY24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
MT24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
FR31.01.2020
GB31.01.2020
IE31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
LU31.01.2020
Former [2021/08]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
FR31.01.2020
GB31.01.2020
IE31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
LU31.01.2020
Former [2020/51]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
FR31.01.2020
GB31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
LU31.01.2020
Former [2020/48]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
FR31.01.2020
GB31.01.2020
LU31.01.2020
Former [2020/46]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
LU31.01.2020
Former [2020/39]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
MC24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/37]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SI24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/36]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/27]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
SM24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
PT25.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
CZ24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
SK24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
PT25.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
PT25.11.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
IT24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
PL24.07.2019
RO24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/22]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
DK24.07.2019
EE24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/17]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
TR24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/15]AL24.07.2019
AT24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/12]AT24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
IS24.11.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/11]AT24.07.2019
ES24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
HR24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
LV24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
RS24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
GR25.10.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/10]AT24.07.2019
FI24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
SE24.07.2019
BG24.10.2019
NO24.10.2019
PT25.11.2019
Former [2020/09]FI24.07.2019
LT24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
NO24.10.2019
Former [2020/08]LT24.07.2019
NL24.07.2019
NO24.10.2019
Former [2020/07]NL24.07.2019
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5987105  (JENKINS JONATHAN PETER [NZ], et al) [XD] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [X]US2010027770  (PARK HYUNG JUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0096] *;
 [X]US2011018729  (KIM YONGTAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0098] *;
 [X]US2011060553  (HAN JONGHYE [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0259] - paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0274] - paragraph [0294] *
by applicantEP0510519
 US5987105
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.