Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2763335

EP2763335 - Transmitter and receiver band pass selection for wireless telemetry systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For:FR 
Service Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town
Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  HR  IS  LI  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  SE  SM 
Prad Research Development Limited
Craigmuir Chambers Road Town
Tortola / VG
For:AL  BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  LT  NO  PL  RO  RS  SI  SK  TR 
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]For:FR 
Service Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
For:GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
Craigmuir Chambers Road Town
Tortola / VG
For:AT  BE  CH  CY  EE  ES  FI  HR  IS  LI  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  PT  SE  SM 
Prad Research Development Limited
Craigmuir Chambers Road Town
Tortola / VG
For:AL  BG  CZ  DE  DK  GR  HU  IE  IT  LT  NO  PL  RO  RS  SI  SK  TR 
SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY B.V.
Parkstraat 83-89
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Croux, Arnaud
c/o Etudes et Productions Schlumberger, 1 rue
Henri Becquerel
92142 Clamart / FR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Rzaniak, Martin , et al
Schlumberger
1, rue Henri Becquerel
B.P. 202
92142 Clamart / FR
[2014/32]
Application number, filing date13153566.831.01.2013
[2014/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2763335
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04B11/00, E21B47/14
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Sender- und Empfängerbandpassauswahl für drahtlose Telemetriesysteme[2014/32]
English:Transmitter and receiver band pass selection for wireless telemetry systems[2014/32]
French:Sélection de bande passante d'émetteur et récepteur pour systèmes de télémétrie sans fil[2014/32]
Examination procedure31.01.2013Examination requested  [2014/32]
31.05.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
12.08.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
07.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/36]
26.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US5148408  (MATTHEWS H GERARD [US]) [XD] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 9 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-18;
 [Y]US2012250461  (MILLOT GUILLAUME [FR], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0094] *;
 [YD]US2006187755  (TINGLEY ROBERT D [US]) [YD] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0024] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0062] * * figure 7 *;
 [AD]US2008180273  (KYLE DONALD G [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5050132
 US5056067
 US5124953
 US5128901
 US5128902
 US5148408
 US5222049
 US5274606
 US5293937
 US5477505
 US5568448
 US5675325
 US5703836
 US5815035
 US5923937
 US5941307
 US5995449
 US6137747
 US6147932
 US6188647
 US6192988
 US6272916
 US6320820
 US6321838
 US6912177
 EP0550521
 EP0636763
 EP0773345
 EP1076245
 EP1193368
 EP1320659
 EP1882811
 WO9624751
 WO9206275
 WO2005005724
 WO0227139
 WO0139412
 WO0077345
 WO2007095111
 US2006187755
 US2008180273