blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2623977

EP2623977 - Method and apparatus for testing a composite object, using tension waves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/32]Method and apparatus for generating tension waves
[2016/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2017/24]
Former [2013/32]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stewart, Alan Frank
10817 Glen Acres Dr. S
Unit C
Seattle, WA 98168 / US
02 / Bossi, Richard H
324 Lind Avenue NW
Renton, WA Washington 98057 / US
03 / Gordon III, Clarence L
16200 SE 178th Street
Renton, WA Washington 98058 / US
 [2017/24]
Former [2013/32]01 / Stewart, Alan Frank
10817 Glen Acres Dr. S
Unit C
Seattle, WA 98168 / US
02 / Bossi, Richard H
324 Lind Avenue NW
Renton, WA Washington 98057 / US
03 / Gordon III, Clarence L
16200 SE 178th Street
Renton, WA Washington 98058 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/32]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13153634.401.02.2013
[2013/32]
Priority number, dateUS20121336388501.02.2012         Original published format: US201213363885
[2013/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2623977
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2623977
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2623977
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:G01N29/24
[2013/32]
CPC:
G01N29/2418 (EP,US); G01N29/28 (EP,US); G01N2291/0421 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung eines Verbundwerkstoff-Objekts, unter Verwendung von Spannwellen[2016/19]
English:Method and apparatus for testing a composite object, using tension waves[2016/19]
French:Procédé et appareil de contrôle d'un objet en matériau composite, utilisant des ondes de tension[2016/19]
Former [2013/32]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Spannwellen
Former [2013/32]Method and apparatus for generating tension waves
Former [2013/32]Procédé et appareil de génération d'ondes de tension
Examination procedure01.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2017Fee for grant paid
24.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17168856.7  / EP3220140
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2016
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.02.2013
AL14.06.2017
AT14.06.2017
CY14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MK14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
PT14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
MT01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2020/34]
Former [2020/31]HU01.02.2013
AT14.06.2017
CY14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MK14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
PT14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
MT01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2020/27]HU01.02.2013
AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
PT14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
MT01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2020/15]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
MT01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2020/08]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
MT01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2019/12]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2019/09]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
IE01.02.2018
LU01.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
LU01.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US6491685  (VISURI STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008212067  (GUPTA VIJAY [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figure 7 *;
 [X]  - "Laser-induced generation of pure tensile stresses", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19970519), vol. 70, no. 20, doi:10.1063/1.118991, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2676 - 2678, XP012017875 [X] 1-9,12-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.118991
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.