Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765108

EP2765108 - Method for providing well access in an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2018  [2018/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kone Corporation
Kartanontie 1
00330 Helsinki / FI
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Kattainen, Ari
Tiilitehtaantie 9
05830 Hyvinkää / FI
02 / Hovi, Antti
Pellonojantie 3
05810 Hyvinkää / FI
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Graf Glück Kritzenberger
Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a
93049 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date13154285.406.02.2013
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765108
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B66B5/00
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Schachtzugang in einem Aufzug[2014/33]
English:Method for providing well access in an elevator[2014/33]
French:Procédé de fourniture d'accès à un puits dans un ascenseur[2014/33]
Examination procedure08.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
24.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/20]
11.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YD]US2008047783  (VOGL WOLFGANG [CH]) [YD] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0026] - [0 30] - [0032] - [0 36] - [0050] *;
 [Y]US2002117358  (SCHOPPA WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 29] , [0 30] *;
 [A]WO2005095249  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1281654  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantUS2008047783