blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2765108 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2765108



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 58
25.04.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
11.04.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.01.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
24.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.07.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
15.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.01.2015 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.01.2014 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
05.08.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
05.08.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
26.07.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
06.02.2013 Description Search / examination 9
06.02.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4