blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2765108


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.04.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.05.2018  [2018/20]
27.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
02.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.07.2017 First examination report
21.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.01.2015 Change - designated states published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
23.01.2015 Change - request for examination published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
12.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
11.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
10.10.2013 Amendment by applicant