Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2626922

EP2626922 - System for the storage of electric energy for a vehicle with electric propulsion and presenting cylindrical chemical batteries embedded in a support matrix [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 30.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 15.06.2016  [2016/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRARI S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
Modena / IT
[2013/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Favaretto, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri, 7/D
41043 Formigine / IT
[2013/33]
Representative(s)Boggio, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/33]
Application number, filing date13154484.307.02.2013
[2013/33]
Priority number, dateIT2012BO0005707.02.2012         Original published format: IT BO20120057
[2013/33]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2626922
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2626922
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP29.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M2/12, B60K6/00, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/655
[2014/28]
Former International [2013/33]H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M2/12, H01M10/50, B60K6/00, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
TitleGerman:System zur Speicherung elektrischer Energie für ein Fahrzeug mit elektrischem Antrieb und mit zylindrischen chemischen Batterien, eingebettet in eine Trägermatrix[2013/33]
English:System for the storage of electric energy for a vehicle with electric propulsion and presenting cylindrical chemical batteries embedded in a support matrix[2013/33]
French:Système pour le stockage de l'énergie électrique pour un véhicule à propulsion avec des batteries chimiques cylindriques intégrées dans une matrice de support[2013/33]
Examination procedure04.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
03.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2014Fee for grant paid
05.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2014
Opposition(s)18.09.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.12.2014
BE17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
IE07.02.2015
LU07.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
[2016/24]
Former [2016/12]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
IE07.02.2015
LU07.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2016/07]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
IE07.02.2015
LU07.02.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
LU07.02.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/46]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
LU07.02.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/44]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
LU07.02.2015
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
PL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/35]EE17.12.2014
ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
PT17.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES17.12.2014
FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
Former [2015/29]FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NL17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
Former [2015/24]FI17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RS17.12.2014
SE17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
GR18.03.2015
Former [2015/23]FI17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT17.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102007010742  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102007010748  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2012003508  (NARBONNE ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0061] , [0 65] - [0073] *;
 [A]US2006214633  (CHO KYU-WOONG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0040] *;
 [A]EP1662602  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 8, 9 *;
 [A]FR2961153  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102008043784  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0031] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102008052284  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 14]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]EP2369656  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0027] * * figures 1-5 *
by applicant   DE102007010742 A1 20080828
    DE102007010748 A1 20080828
    US2012003508 A1 20120105
    EP2325034 A1 20110525