Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2626923

EP2626923 - A vehicle with electric propulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 26.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRARI S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
Modena / IT
[2013/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Favaretto, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri, 7/D
41043 Formigine / IT
[2013/33]
Representative(s)Boggio, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/33]
Application number, filing date13154487.607.02.2013
[2013/33]
Priority number, dateIT2012BO0005607.02.2012         Original published format: IT BO20120056
[2013/33]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2626923
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2626923
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, H01M10/613, H01M10/625, H01M10/653, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525, H01M2/12
[2014/20]
Former International [2013/45]H01M2/10, H01M10/50, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525, H01M2/12
Former International [2013/33]H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M2/12, H01M10/50, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb[2013/33]
English:A vehicle with electric propulsion[2013/33]
French:Véhicule à propulsion électrique[2013/33]
Examination procedure13.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
21.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2014Fee for grant paid
24.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2013
Opposition(s)05.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
IE07.02.2015
LU07.02.2015
FR02.03.2015
[2016/12]
Former [2016/07]AT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
IE07.02.2015
LU07.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU07.02.2015
Former [2015/44]AT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU07.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/30]AT04.06.2014
BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/11]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
PL04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/10]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
CZ04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/52]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
RS04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
HR04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
LV04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
NO04.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY04.06.2014
LT04.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY04.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE102007010742  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE102007010748  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]US2012003508  (NARBONNE ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0061] , [0 65] - [0073] *;
 [A]EP1662602  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 8, 9 *;
 [A]DE102008043784  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0031] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2006214633  (CHO KYU-WOONG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0040] *;
 [A]FR2961153  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE102008052284  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 14] * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [AD]EP2369656  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0027] * * figures 1-5 *
by applicant   DE102007010742 A1 20080828
    DE102007010748 A1 20080828
    US2012003508 A1 20120105
    EP2325034 A1 20110525