Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2626924

EP2626924 - A vehicle with electric propulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 25.07.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FERRARI S.p.A.
Via Emilia Est, 1163
Modena / IT
[2013/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Favaretto, Fabrizio
Via Dante Alighieri, 7/D
41043 Formigine / IT
[2013/33]
Representative(s)Boggio, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2013/33]
Application number, filing date13154492.607.02.2013
[2013/33]
Priority number, dateIT2012BO0005607.02.2012         Original published format: IT BO20120056
[2013/33]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2626924
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2626924
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, H01M10/60, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525, H01M2/12
[2014/12]
Former International [2013/42]H01M2/10, H01M10/50, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525, H01M2/12
Former International [2013/33]H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M2/12, H01M10/50, B60K1/04, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, // H01M10/0525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug mit Elektroantrieb[2013/33]
English:A vehicle with electric propulsion[2013/33]
French:Véhicule à propulsion électrique[2013/33]
Examination procedure13.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/33]
27.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2014Fee for grant paid
29.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2013
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
[2016/28]
Former [2015/46]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
ES19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
NL19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP2369656  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP])
 [A]DE102007010742  (DAIMLER AG [DE])
 [A]DE102007010748  (DAIMLER AG [DE])
 [A]US2012003508  (NARBONNE ALEXANDRE [FR], et al)
 [A]EP1662602  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR])
 [A]DE102008043784  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])
 [A]US2006214633  (CHO KYU-WOONG [KR])
 [A]FR2961153  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR])
 [A]DE102008052284  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE])
by applicant EP2369656
  EP2325034