Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2741213

EP2741213 - Techniques for test automation in emergent systems technical field [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI, LU, SI
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2014/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Harbarth, Juliane
Groß-Gerauer-Str. 50a
64347 Griesheim / DE
02 / Schöning, Harald, Dr.
Theobaldstr. 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
03 / Kuhn, Helmut
Bessunger Str. 114 B
64347 Griesheim / DE
 [2014/24]
Representative(s)Wegner, Hans , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/24]
Application number, filing date13154605.308.02.2013
[2014/24]
Priority number, dateUS20121370811007.12.2012         Original published format: US201213708110
[2014/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2741213
Date:11.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2741213
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/36
[2014/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/24]
TitleGerman:Techniken zur Prüfungsautomatisierung auf dem technischen Gebiet der aufstrebenden Systeme[2014/24]
English:Techniques for test automation in emergent systems technical field[2014/24]
French:Techniques d'automatisation de tests dans le domaine technique des systèmes émergents[2017/16]
Former [2014/24]Techniques d'automatisation d'essai dans le domaine technique des systèmes émergents
Examination procedure08.02.2013Examination requested  [2014/24]
11.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2017
14.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2017Fee for grant paid
08.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.02.2016
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU08.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/44]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]  - KALLEPALLI ET AL, "Measuring and modeling usage and reliability for statistical Web testing", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, (20010101), vol. 27, no. 11, doi:10.1109/32.965342, ISSN 0098-5589, pages 1023 - 1036, XP055070923 [I] 1-11,14,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/32.965342
 [I]  - OSAMA SAMMODI ET AL, "Usage-Based Online Testing for Proactive Adaptation of Service-Based Applications", COMPUTER SOFTWARE AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE (COMPSAC), 2011 IEEE 35TH ANNUAL, IEEE, (20110718), doi:10.1109/COMPSAC.2011.81, ISBN 978-1-4577-0544-1, pages 582 - 587, XP031972283 [I] 1-12,14,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMPSAC.2011.81
 [A]  - Gerd Schneider ET AL, "The CentraSite Community: Fast-tracking SOA Governance using best-of-breed solutions", (20080901), pages 1 - 22, URL: http://techcommunity.softwareag.com/download/business-community/Doing SOA/WP_CS_Community_med.pdf, (20130711), XP055070919 [A] 1-11,14,15 * page 7 - page 8 * * page 14 - page 16 *
 [A]  - Mustafa Bozkurt ET AL, "TestingWeb Services: A Survey TR-10-01", http://www.dcs.kcl.ac.uk/technical-reports/2010.html, (20100101), pages 1 - 49, URL: http://www.dcs.kcl.ac.uk/technical-reports/papers/TR-10-01.pdf, (20130711), XP055070967 [A] 1-11,14,15 * the whole document *