Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2634385

EP2634385 - Adjustable Camshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/21]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Flender, Thomas
Hauffstraße 2
71735 Eberdingen / DE
02 / Kreisig, Michael
Gutenbergstraße 130
70197 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Rommel, Jürgen
Hauptstraße 65
71576 Burgstetten / DE
 [2013/36]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/21]
Former [2013/36]BRP Renaud & Partner
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13154654.108.02.2013
[2013/36]
Priority number, dateDE20121020314529.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012203145
[2013/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2634385
Date:04.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2634385
Date:25.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/047
[2013/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Former [2013/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verstellbare Nockenwelle[2013/36]
English:Adjustable Camshaft[2013/36]
French:Arbre à came réglable[2013/36]
Examination procedure23.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/10]
01.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2016Fee for grant paid
12.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2017  10.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG
Wirtschaftspark 37
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
Kilchert, Jochen
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [2018/12]
Former [2018/11]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2017  10.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG
Wirtschaftspark 37
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Former [2017/11]
Opponent(s)01  06.02.2017   
ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG
Wirtschaftspark 37
9492 Eschen / LI
Opponent's representative
ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
05.04.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.08.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
15.08.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.08.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2603/18
07.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
20.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.02.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MK25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
AT08.02.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU08.02.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
AT08.02.2018
Former [2019/39]HU08.02.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
AT08.02.2018
Former [2019/31]HU08.02.2013
AL25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
AT08.02.2018
Former [2019/23]AL25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
AT08.02.2018
Former [2018/46]AL25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU08.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE28.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
BE28.02.2017
Former [2017/11]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2011065326  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1,9 * figures 2,4 *;
 [P]US2012145101  (YOSHIKA DAISUKE [JP], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]JP2009144522  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0026]; figure 5 *;
 [Y]US2009229551  (CLEVER GLENN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024] - [0027]; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US6691656  (PIERIK RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE102009049217  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2048385  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE102005062207  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005014680  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053]; figures 1,2,6 *
by applicantDE102005038656
OppositionWO2011065326
 JP2009144522
 US2009229551
 US6691656
 DE102009049217
 EP2048385
 DE102005062207
 DE102005014680
 DE102009041426
 DE102006008532
 EP1245329
 DE4433277
 DE10305947
 EP2272630
 DE4226922
 US2011197839
 JP2011117414
    - "Dichtungen", KÜNNE, BERND, Köhler/Rögnitz Maschinenteile 1, Wiesbaden, Teubner Verlag, (20070400), pages fr-10,421 - 460, XP055351779