Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2626629

EP2626629 - Detection system and method to detect flame holding event [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, New York 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Krull, Anthony Wayne
General Electric Company
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 12615 / US
02 / Kraemer, Gilbert Otto
300 Garlington Road
Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US
 [2013/33]
Representative(s)Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
General Electric Technology GmbH
GE Corporate Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]Cleary, Fidelma
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date13154705.108.02.2013
[2013/33]
Priority number, dateUS20121337096310.02.2012         Original published format: US201213370963
[2013/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2626629
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2626629
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F23N5/24, F23R3/00
[2013/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Detektionssystem und Verfahren zum Erkennen eines Flammhaltungsereignisses[2013/33]
English:Detection system and method to detect flame holding event[2013/33]
French:Procédé et système de détection d'événement de maintien de flamme[2013/33]
Examination procedure26.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
14.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010170217  (KRAEMER GILBERT OTTO [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010275573  (FREDERICK GARTH CURTIS [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010180564  (ZIMINSKY WILLY STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010180674  (ZIMINSKY WILLY STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2249005  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0962704  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *