Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765431

EP2765431 - Carrier for electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rasco GmbH
Geigelsteinstrasse 6
83059 Kolbermoor / DE
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Waldauf, Alexander
Sonnbichl 35a
6306 Söll / AT
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/21]
Former [2014/33]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13154816.611.02.2013
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765431
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2765431
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/28
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/33]
TitleGerman:Träger für elektronische Komponenten[2014/33]
English:Carrier for electronic components[2014/33]
French:Support de composants électroniques[2014/33]
Examination procedure21.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/33]
31.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2016Fee for grant paid
06.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2014
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
GB11.02.2017
IE11.02.2017
LU11.02.2017
MT11.02.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
GB11.02.2017
IE11.02.2017
LU11.02.2017
MT11.02.2017
Former [2018/13]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
GB11.02.2017
IE11.02.2017
LU11.02.2017
Former [2018/04]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU11.02.2017
Former [2017/48]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0373551  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD, et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [X]EP2290375  (MULTITEST ELEKTRONISCHE SYST [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0082] , [0083]; figures 1-7 *;
 [XD]US2010206768  (HOFMANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US2006154386  (CHENG CHI W [CN], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007131733  (CHENG CHI W [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040]; figure 7 *
ExaminationUS2009104014
by applicantUS7258703
 US2010206768