EP2633997 - Fluid cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harvey, David C Hewlett-Packard Company 1070 NE Circle Blvd Corvallis, OR Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
Gonzales, Curt Hewlett-Packard Company 1070 NE Circle Blvd Corvallis, OR Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 03 /
Stathem, Ralph L 30528 Ty Valley Rd Lebanon, OR Oregon 97355 / US | 04 /
Olsen, David Hewlett-Packard Company 1070 NE Circle Blvd Corvallis, OR Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 05 /
Welter, David Hewlett-Packard Company 1070 NE Circle Blvd Corvallis, OR Oregon 97330-4239 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Frankhuizen, Jan Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Camí de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Frankhuizen, Jan Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Camí de Can Graells, 1-21 08173 Sant Cugat del Vallés / ES | Application number, filing date | 13155259.8 | 22.10.2010 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633997 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633997 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
B41J2/17526 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/1755 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,KR,US);
B41L27/00 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitskartusche | [2013/36] | English: | Fluid cartridge | [2013/36] | French: | Cartouche de fluide | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 04.11.2013 | Observations by third parties | 05.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10855127.6 / EP2588320 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100855127) is 28.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.05.2014 | BG | 28.05.2014 | CY | 28.05.2014 | EE | 28.05.2014 | HR | 28.05.2014 | IS | 28.05.2014 | LT | 28.05.2014 | LV | 28.05.2014 | MC | 28.05.2014 | MK | 28.05.2014 | MT | 28.05.2014 | RO | 28.05.2014 | RS | 28.05.2014 | SI | 28.05.2014 | SK | 28.05.2014 | SM | 28.05.2014 | LU | 22.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | BG | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MK | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BG | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
SM | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
LU | 22.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
RS | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
HR | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 28.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2007013753 (STEINMETZ CHARLIE [US], et al) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 48] , [0 49] , [0055] , [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 81] , [0 82]; figures 5, 6, 12, 13, 27, 28 *; | [AD]GB2316657 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] 1-17 * page 7, line 1 - line 8; figures 1, 3 * * page 7, line 18 - line 20 * * page 8, line 19 - line 22 *; | [AD]EP1348562 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraph [0030]; figures 10,14 *; | [AD]US2008168481 (LAN CHING-LONG [TW], et al) [AD] 1-17 * paragraph [0030]; figures 6,7,11 *; | [AD]EP1122078 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 37] , [0 51]; figures 3,5a-5d, 9a-9c; claim 11 * | by applicant | EP1348562 | US2008168481 | EP1122078 | US2007013753 | GB2316657 | other | EP1798046 |