Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2633852

EP2633852 - Jojoba oil-containing ophthalmic spray composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.03.2014
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biodue S.p.A.
Via A. Lorenzetti 3/A
Frazione Sambuca Val di Pesa
50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa / IT
[2013/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Benedetti, Ruffo
Via delle Sodera 18
50023 Impruneta / IT
 [2013/36]
Representative(s)Brighenti, Livio , et al
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2013/36]
Application number, filing date13157381.801.03.2013
[2013/36]
Priority number, dateIT2012FI0004401.03.2012         Original published format: IT FI20120044
[2013/36]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2633852
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K47/42, A61K8/00, A61K47/44
[2013/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Jojobaöl enthaltende Zusammensetzung für ein Augenspray[2013/36]
English:Jojoba oil-containing ophthalmic spray composition[2013/36]
French:Composition contenant de l'huile de jojoba pour un spray ophthalmique[2013/36]
Examination procedure03.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006004577  (MELBJ HOLDINGS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * claims 1-25 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0007] *;
 [X]US2005202097  (MASKIN STEVEN [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0049] * * claims 1-43 *;
 [X]WO9401089  (DIANORM GERAETE G MAIERHOFER [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * claims 1-15 * * page 2, line 22 - page 15, line 2 * * page 38, line 10 - page 42, line 12 *;
 [A]CN101697955  (HAINAN JINGRUN PEARL BIOTECHNO) [A] 1-7 * abstract *