blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2601933

EP2601933 - Hydrophilic filtration during manufacture of vaccine adjuvants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.02.2023
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2023Revocation of patentpublished on 22.03.2023  [2023/12]
17.02.2023New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seqirus UK Limited
Point
29 Market Street
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 8AA / GB
[2022/50]
Former [2013/24]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Kraus, Gottfried
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
02 / Eskes, Robert
Veilchenweg 6
35287 Amo eburg / DE
 [2013/24]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/41]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2013/24]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date13157613.403.12.2010
[2013/24]
Priority number, dateUS20090283517P03.12.2009         Original published format: US 283517 P
[2013/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2601933
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2601933
Date:07.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2013
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/107, A61K39/12, A61K39/39
[2013/24]
CPC:
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/107 (KR,US); A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP); B01F27/2711 (EP,KR,US); B01F33/811 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,KR,US); A61K9/1075 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/41]
Former [2013/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hydrophile Filtrierung bei der Herstellung von Impfstoffhilfsstoffen[2013/24]
English:Hydrophilic filtration during manufacture of vaccine adjuvants[2013/24]
French:Filtration hydrophile pendant la fabrication d'adjuvants de vaccins[2015/41]
Former [2013/24]Filtration hydrophile pendant la fabrication dýadjuvants de vaccins
Examination procedure06.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/03]
04.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2015Fee for grant paid
20.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10807661.3  / EP2506832
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100807661) is  28.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Alatis
3, rue Paul Escudier
75009 Paris / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Thornley, Rachel Mary
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2022/24]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Alatis
3 rue Paul Escudier
75009 Paris / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Thornley, Rachel Mary
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2020/51]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Air Liquide
L'Air Liquide S.A.
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Thornley, Rachel Mary
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2019/11]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Laigneau, Amandine
L'Air Liquide
Direction Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Thornley, Rachel Mary
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2017/46]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier
L'Air Liquide S.A.
Intellectual Property Department
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Thornley, Rachel Mary
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2016/33]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR LES INDUSTRIES CHIMIQUES - SEPPIC
75, quai d'Orsay
F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Opponent's representative
Grout de Beaufort, François-Xavier
L'Air Liquide S.A.
Intellectual Property Department
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 02  07.07.2016  12.07.2016  ADMISSIBLE
GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A.
P.O. Box rue de l'Institut 89
1330 Rixensart / BE
Opponent's representative
Verbeure, Birgit Maria
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
11.08.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.04.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
31.08.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.08.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.11.2022Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/12]
03.02.2023Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2623/18
10.01.2019Statement of grounds filed
21.11.2022Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
03.02.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
25.10.2018Appeal received No.  T2623/18
07.12.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.11.2022Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
03.02.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
21.11.2022Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2010
AL07.10.2015
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE03.12.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU03.12.2010
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MK07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE03.12.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU03.12.2010
BG07.10.2015
CY07.10.2015
CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
MT07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE03.12.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
IE03.12.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ07.10.2015
DK07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
SM07.10.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ07.10.2015
EE07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RO07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
SK07.10.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ07.10.2015
FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
LU03.12.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/33]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
MC07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/25]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
LV07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/24]FI07.10.2015
HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
PL07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
GR08.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
PT08.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR07.10.2015
LT07.10.2015
RS07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
IS07.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT07.10.2015
NO07.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT07.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US6168718  (SUTTER MARK ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006008504  (HEALTH PROT AGENCY [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 14, line 21 - line 25 * * page 18, line 20 - page 21, line 1 *;
 [A]US2006148776  (ULM EDQAR H [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * example 6 *;
 [A]WO2006100110  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 5, line 5 - line 23 * * page 15, line 28 - page 16, line 32 * * examples 2,3 ** page 96, line 1 - line 13 *;
 [A]US2009263422  (HANON EMMANUEL JULES [BE], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0089] * * example 2 * * example 4 * * paragraph [0377] * * paragraph [0389] - paragraph [0404] *
by applicantUS4060082
 US4340482
 US4413074
 US4432875
 US4473474
 US4473475
 EP0139417
 US4618533
 EP0221046
 US4673504
 US4705753
 WO9004609
 US4943374
 US4964990
 WO9014837
 EP0520618
 US5178765
 US5277812
 US5531893
 WO9737000
 WO9801174
 WO9917820
 US5971953
 WO0007647
 US6039872
 US6071406
 US6193077
 WO0122992
 WO02097072
 US6495050
 US6495043
 US6692468
 WO2005089837
 WO2006044463
 US2007014805
 WO2007052155
 WO2007080308
 EP2029170
    - PODDA; DEL GIUDICE, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 197 - 203
    - PODDA, VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2673 - 2680
    - "Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation Methods and Research Protocols", Methods in Molecular Medicine series, vol. 42
    - O'HAGAN, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2007), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 699 - 710
    - BAUDNER ET AL., PHARM RES., (2009), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 1477 - 85
    - DUPUIS ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 18, pages 434 - 9
    - DUPUIS ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 31, pages 2910 - 8
    - BURKE ET AL., JLNFECT DIS, (1994), vol. 170, pages 1110 - 9
    - JAFARI ET AL., FOOD HYDROCOLLOIDS, (2008), vol. 22, pages 1191 - 1202
    - CHEN ET AL., JOURNAL OFAPPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 72, pages 1699 - 1711
    - WAVHAL; FISHER, JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART B: POLYMER PHYSICS, (2002), vol. 40, pages 2473 - 88
    - ESPINOZA-GÓMEZ ET AL., REVISTA DE LA SOCIEDAD QUIMICA DE MéXICO, (2003), vol. 47, pages 53 - 57
    - LIDGATE ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 860 - 863
    - HOFFMANN ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages 3165 - 3170
    - SUBBARAO ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 305, pages 192 - 200
    - LIU ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 314, pages 580 - 590
    - OZAKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 1851 - 1857
    - WEBBY ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 363, pages 1099 - 1103
    - BRANDS ET AL., DEV BIOL STAND, (1999), vol. 98, pages 93 - 100
    - HALPERIN ET AL., VACCINE, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1240 - 7
    - TREE ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 3444 - 50
    - KISTNER ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 960 - 8
    - KISTNER ET AL., DEV BIOL STAND, (1999), vol. 98, pages 101 - 110
    - BRUHL ET AL., VACCINE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 1149 - 58
    - PAU ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 2716 - 21
    - HEHME ET AL., VIRUS RES., (2004), vol. 103, no. 1-2, pages 163 - 71
    - TREANOR ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1996), vol. 173, pages 1467 - 70
    - KEITEL ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 3, pages 507 - 10
    - WILLIAMSON ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2006), vol. 74, pages 961 - 7
    - LOUKAS ET AL., PLOS MED, (2005), vol. 2, no. 10, page E295
    - HARPER ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 364, no. 9447, pages 1757 - 65
    - J TOXICOL CLIN TOXICOL, (2001), vol. 39, pages 85 - 100
    - DEMICHELI ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 880 - 884
    - STEPANOV ET AL., J BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 44, pages 155 - 160
    - BANZHOFF, IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 71, pages 91 - 96
    - GREENBAUM ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 2566 - 77
    - ZURBRIGGEN ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 295 - 304
    - PIASCIK, JAM PHARM ASSOC (WASH DC, (2003), vol. 43, pages 728 - 30
    - MANN ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 2425 - 9
    - HALPERIN ET AL., AM J PUBLIC HEALTH, (1979), vol. 69, pages 1247 - 50
    - HERBERT ET AL., JLNFECT DIS, (1979), vol. 140, pages 234 - 8
    - CHEN ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 2830 - 6
OppositionWO9405298
 WO2006100110
 EP2506832
    - LIDGATE et al., "Sterile Filtration of a Parenteral Emulsion", Pharmaceutical Research, (19920000), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 860 - 863, XP055302469
    - JORNITZ et al., "Modern Sterile Filtration", The Economics, Pharmaceutical Technology Europe, (20030600), pages 29 - 32, XP055302473
    - "Membranes and filtration: Membrane filtration in the biopharm industry", Filtration & Separation, (20081000), vol. 45, no. 8, pages 18 - 21, XP025479706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0015-1882(08)70294-5
    - Dixit et al., "Biopharmaceutical industry: The importance of prefiltration", Filtration & Separation, (20070700), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 24 - 26, XP022142398

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0015-1882(07)70181-7
    - "Products and Solutions for the BiopharmaceuticaI Industry", Sartorius catalog, (20090000), pages 1 - 52, XP055302487
    - "Sartorius Press Release", Biosearch Online, (20091020), XP055302492
    - Dunleavy et al., "Polyethersulfone Membranes Facilitate Sterile Filtration of Biological Materials", Bioscience Technology, (20030801), URL: http://www.biosciencetechnology.com/articles/2003/01/polyethersulfone-membranes-facilitate- sterile-filtration-biological-materials, XP055302496
    - LIDGATE et al., "Development of an Emulsion-Based Muramyl Dipeptide Adjuvant Formulation for Vaccines.", Vaccine design: The subunit and adjuvant approach., New York, (19950000), pages 313 - 324, XP001248049
    - ALLISON, "Squalene and Squalane Emulsions as Adjuvants", Methods, (19990000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 87 - 93, XP004466810

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.1999.0832
    - OTT et al., "The Adjuvant MF59: A 10-year Perspective. Vaccine Adjuvants: Preparation methods and Research Protocols.", Methods in Molecular medicine, Vol., (20000000), vol. 42, pages 211 - 228, XP002501687
    - OTT et al., "MF59 Design and evaluation of a safe and potent adjuvant for human vaccines", Vaccine Design: The subunit and Adjuvant Approach, (19950000), vol. 6, pages 277 - 296, XP001206665
    - CARDONA et al., "Filtration Designs Remove Processing Bottlenecks for HighYield", Biotech Drugs., (20060000), pages 1 - 6, (20141120), XP055302565
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.