EP2682858 - Document delivery to a mobile device using mobile device based permissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2019/46] |
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chakirov, Martin c/o Research In Motion TAT AB Torggatan 2 211 40 Malmö / SE | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Straße 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/02] | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13157671.2 | 04.03.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | US201261667825P | 03.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261667825 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2682858 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2682858 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2682858 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, // G06K15/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1238 (US);
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F3/1222 (US);
G06F3/1245 (EP,US);
G06F3/1292 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | Verwaltung der Dokumentabgabe an eine mobile Vorrichtung basierend auf Zulassingen von mobielen Vorrichtungen | [2014/02] | English: | Document delivery to a mobile device using mobile device based permissions | [2014/02] | French: | Gestion de distribution de document à un dispositif mobile utilisant autorisations en fonction du dispositif mobile | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 01.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.10.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2013 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IE | 04.03.2020 | LU | 04.03.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IE | 04.03.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
LU | 04.03.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1465051 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]US2004205453 (MORTENSEN STERLING [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2010309510 (HANSEN JARED [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0073] * |