Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2636596

EP2636596 - Engine starting system for rotorcraft in flight [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation
6900 Main Street
Stratford, CT 06615-9129 / US
[2013/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Smiley, Alfred Russel
29 Roberts Road
Marlborough, CT 06447 / US
02 / Strauss, Michael Peter
173 Ellsworth Avenue, Apt. 2
New Haven, CT 06511 / US
03 / Cycon, James Peter
346 Arbor Circle
Media, PA 19063 / US
 [2013/37]
Representative(s)Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2018/45]
Former [2013/37]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date13157808.005.03.2013
[2013/37]
Priority number, dateUS20121341277806.03.2012         Original published format: US201213412778
[2013/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2636596
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2636596
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2636596
Date:07.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B64C27/12, B64D41/00, F02N11/08
[2017/16]
Former International [2013/37]B64C27/12, B64D41/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/48]
Former [2013/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Motorstartsystem für Drehflügler im Flug[2018/45]
English:Engine starting system for rotorcraft in flight[2013/37]
French:Système de démarrage de moteur pour giravions en vol[2013/37]
Former [2013/37]Motorstartsystem für Rotorfahrzeug beim Flug
Examination procedure05.03.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/48]
17.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2018Fee for grant paid
26.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2330872  (SCHLUMBERGER COMPTEURS [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 * [A] 2-10;
 [IA]US2004189098  (ALGRAIN MARCELO C [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0014] - [0065]; figure 3 * [A] 2-10;
 [IA]US2010038961  (DIVITO ROCCO [CA], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figure 2 * [A] 2-10;
 [XA]US2009056661  (COOK ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0010] - [0025]; figure 1 * [A] 2-10;
 [XA]US6321707  (DUNN JAMES [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 20; figure 1 * [A] 2-10