Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2636332

EP2636332 - Stowing device, in particular life jacket stowing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Recaro Aircraft Seating GmbH & Co. KG
Daimlerstrasse 21
74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE
[2013/37]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
02 / Meisl, Stephan
Wolfsteinerstr. 24
93051 Regensburg / DE
03 / * * *
 [2013/37]
Representative(s)Daub, Thomas
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub
Bahnhofstrasse 5
88662 Überlingen / DE
[2013/37]
Application number, filing date13157865.005.03.2013
[2013/37]
Priority number, dateDE2012100415405.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012004154
[2013/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2636332
Date:11.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2636332
Date:12.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2636332
Date:09.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:A45C13/10, B64D11/06, // B63C9/23, B64D25/18
[2018/02]
Former International [2017/15]A45C13/10, B63C9/23, B64D11/06
Former International [2013/37]A45C11/00, A45C13/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/46]
Former [2013/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verstauvorrichtung, insbesondere Schwimmwestenverstauvorrichtung[2013/37]
English:Stowing device, in particular life jacket stowing device[2013/37]
French:Dispositif de rangement, notamment dispositif de rangement de gilets de sauvetage[2013/37]
Examination procedure05.03.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.10.2017Examination requested  [2017/46]
12.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2019Fee for grant paid
22.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2002187594  (K SEVEN KK) [X] 1-7,10,12,16 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 18] , [0 24] *;
 [X]FR2129702  (BEAUFORT AIR SEA EQUIPMENT LTD) [X] 1-13,16 * figure 2 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 14 *;
 [X]US6902453  (SWITLIK STANLEY [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12,14-16 * abstract * * figures 4A, 4B *;
 [X]US4297758  (MORAN HAROLD J) [X] 1-13,15,16 * abstract * * figures 6, 7 *