Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775463

EP2775463 - Systems and methods for reducing the impact of alarm sounds on patients [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2015  [2015/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For all designated states
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Kohlrausch, Armin Gerhard
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / Falck, Thomas
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / Park, Mun Hum
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / Jelfs, Sam Martin
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / Leuschner, Katja
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Damen, Daniel Martijn
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Damen, Daniel Martijn
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13158006.006.03.2013
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775463
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G08B3/10, A61B5/11, G08B21/22
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren zur Reduzierung der Folge eines Alarmtons auf Patienten[2014/37]
English:Systems and methods for reducing the impact of alarm sounds on patients[2014/37]
French:Systèmes et procédés pour réduire l'impact de sons d'alarme sur des patients[2014/37]
Examination procedure06.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/37]
11.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/39]
21.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US7920061  (KLEIN KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * column 1, lines 1-13 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, lines 21-43,59-63 * * column 3, lines 15-47,57-62 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8 [I] 6;
 [Y]US2005146431  (HASTINGS DAVID C [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0015] *