blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2775463 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2775463



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 71
07.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.08.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.04.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
14.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
13.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
29.07.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.07.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.07.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
18.07.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
06.03.2013 Description Search / examination 18
06.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 8
06.03.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5