blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2775463 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480012317 EP13158006 EP14712358



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9693739Global Dossier 04.07.2017B2
US2016015329 21.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6312719BGlobal Dossier 18.04.2018B2
JP2016517558 16.06.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2965298Global Dossier 10.05.2017B1
EP2965298 13.01.2016A2
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
EP14712358 06.03.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105027169BGlobal Dossier 13.10.2017B
CN105027169 04.11.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2903626 12.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX350897 22.09.2017B
MX2015011365 16.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014IB59477 06.03.2014
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014136069Global Dossier 04.12.2014A3
WO2014136069 12.09.2014A2
Priority number Date
EP13158006 06.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2775463Global Dossier 10.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13158006 06.03.2013