Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2637113

EP2637113 - Client system and server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.10.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OK Wave
1-19-5 Ebisu, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 150-0013 / JP
[2013/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Kanemoto, Kaneto
1-1-3 Naruse, Machida-shi
Tokyo, Tokyo 194-0044 / JP
02 / Kato, Yoshinori
1-5-6-1504 Shitaya, Taito-ku
Tokyo, 110-0004 / JP
 [2013/49]
Former [2013/37]01 / Kanemoto, Kaneto
1-19-15 Ebisu, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 150-0013 / JP
02 / Kato, Yoshinori
1-19-15 Ebisu, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 150-0013 / JP
Representative(s)Vorberg, Jens
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Vorberg, Jens
Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date13158021.906.03.2013
[2013/37]
Priority number, dateJP2012004886906.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012048869
[2013/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2637113
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2013/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Clientsystem und Server[2013/37]
English:Client system and server[2013/37]
French:Système client et serveur[2013/37]
Examination procedure05.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/16]
17.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination10.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1955/17
10.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - Joachim Griesbaum, "Entwicklungstrends im Web Information Retrieval: Neue Potentiale für die Webrecherche durch Personalisierung & Web 2.0-Technologien?", Information in Wissenschaft, Bildung und Wirtschaft. Proceedings der 29. Online-Tagung der DGI, Frankfurt a. M., (2007), pages 1 - 29, URL: http://fiz1.fh-potsdam.de/volltext/konstanz/08001.pdf, (20130621), XP055067715 [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * abstract * * sections 3.1-3.4 * [I] 3,6,7,9-17
 [A]  - SILVIA QUARTERONI ET AL, User Modelling for Personalized Question Answering, AI*IA 2007: ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE AND HUMAN-ORIENTED COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 386 - 397, (20070910), ISBN 978-3-540-74781-9, XP019099651 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [A]  - JAIME TEEVAN ET AL, "Discovering and using groups to improve personalized search", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WEB SEARCH AND DATA MINING, WSDM '09, New York, New York, USA, (20090212), doi:10.1145/1498759.1498786, ISBN 978-1-60-558390-7, pages 15 - 24, XP055067806 [A] 16,17 * second paragraph on left column; page 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1498759.1498786
by applicantJP2007034772