Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2774919

EP2774919 - Novel sulfonamide TRPA1 receptor antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.09.2015  [2015/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHARMESTE S.R.L. IN LIQUIDAZIONE
Foro Buonaparte 69
20121 Milano / IT
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Fruttarolo, Francesca
Via Giovanni Falcone, 36
44124 FERRARA / IT
02 / Pavani, Maria Giovanna
Via Frutteti, 16
44049 VIGARANO MAINARDA (FE) / IT
03 / Bencivenni, Serena
Via Dino Fabbri, 11
44042 CENTO (FE) / IT
04 / Gatti, Raffaele
Via Boschetto, 44a
44124 FERRARA / IT
05 / Napoletano, Mauro
Via Venini, 37
20127 MILANO / IT
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13158046.606.03.2013
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2774919
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/74, C07D333/34, C07C311/19, C07D213/40, A61K31/18, A61K31/381, A61K31/435, A61P29/00
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Neuartige Sulfonamid-TRPA1-Rezeptorantagnonisten[2014/37]
English:Novel sulfonamide TRPA1 receptor antagonists[2014/37]
French:Nouveaux antagonistes des récepteurs TRPA1 de sulfonamide[2014/37]
Examination procedure06.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/37]
11.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/39]
16.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2010141805  (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,19 *
by applicant   JAQUEMAR ET AL., J. BIO. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 7325 - 7333,
    STORY ET AL., CELL, (2003), vol. 112, pages 819 - 829,
    COREY ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, page 23730,
    NAGATA ET AL., J NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, pages 4052 - 4061,
    DIOGENES ET AL., J. DENT. RES., (2007), vol. 86, pages 550 - 555,
    BAUTISTA ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, pages 12248 - 12252,
    NAGATA ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, pages 4052 - 4061,
    OBATA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2005), vol. 115, pages 2393 - 2401,
    FREDERICK ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2007), vol. 358, pages 1058 - 1064,
    BANDELL ET AL., NEURON, (2004), vol. 41, pages 849 - 857,
    NAMER ET AL., NEUROREPORT, (2005), vol. 16, pages 955 - 959,
    BAUTISTA ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 124, pages 1269 - 1282,
    FUJITA ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 151, pages 153 - 160,
    MCNAMARA ET AL., PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, pages 13525 - 13530,
    JORDT ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 427, pages 260 - 265,
    KWAN ET AL., NEURON, (2006), vol. 50, pages 277 - 289,
    ANDRE ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2008), vol. 118, pages 2574 - 2582,
    DU ET AL., UROLOGY, (2008), vol. 72, pages 450 - 455,
    ANDRADE ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2006), vol. 72, pages 104 - 114,
    GRATZKE ET AL., EUR. UROLOGY, (20080430),
    STRENG ET AL., EUR. UROLOGY, (2008), vol. 53, pages 391 - 400,
    YANG ET AL., NEUROSCI LETT., (2008), vol. 440, pages 237 - 241,
    Design of Prodrugs, ELSEVIER,
    Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. XIV, page 33,