Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639348

EP2639348 - Slit yarn knitting method in circular knitting machine, apparatus therefor and knit fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precision Fukuhara Works, Ltd.
3-5 Ibukidai-higashimachi 7-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2242 / JP
[2013/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamaoka, Takashi
c/o PRECISION FUKUHARA WORKS, LTD.
3-5, Ibukidai-higashimachi 7-chome, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2242 / JP
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Karakatsanis, Georgios
Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dietlindenstrasse 18
80802 München / DE
[2013/38]
Application number, filing date13158186.007.03.2013
[2013/38]
Priority number, dateJP2012005541513.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012055415
[2013/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639348
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:D04B35/22, D04B1/16
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spaltgarnstrickverfahren in Rundstrickmaschinen, Vorrichtung dafür und Maschenware[2013/38]
English:Slit yarn knitting method in circular knitting machine, apparatus therefor and knit fabric[2013/38]
French:Procédé de tricotage de fil à fente dans une machine à tricoter circulaire, appareil correspondant et étoffe[2013/38]
Examination procedure19.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/38]
28.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/38]
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB1260956  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [X] 1,7-9,11-13 * page 3, line 59 - line 108; figure 3 * [I] 10;
 [X]US3331222  (MARKS RONALD H) [X] 1,7,11,13 * column 7, line 48 - column 9, line 23; figures 3-5 *
by applicantJP2005023445
 JP2005248407
 JP2010144288