Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639481

EP2639481 - Wafer check valve assembly and related methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hayward Industries, Inc.
620 Division Street
Elizabeth NJ 07201 / US
[2018/19]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
Hayward Industries, Inc.
620 Division Street
Elizabeth NJ 07201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Moren, Gary
135 Broadmoor Drive
Advance, NC North Carolina 27006 / US
02 / Hoots, Joshua
157 Wildwood Place
Clemmons, NC North Carolina 27012 / US
03 / Stone, Jon
980 Boyer Drive
Clemmons, NC North Carolina 27012 / US
04 / Gutmann, Paul
229 Arrow Leaf Drive
Lewisville, NC North Carolina 27023 / US
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2018/19]
Former [2013/48]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/38]Lessard, Jason Donat , et al
Clifton Cowley Legal
25 Meer Street
Stratford-upon-Avon, Warks. CV37 6QB / GB
Application number, filing date13158691.912.03.2013
[2013/38]
Priority number, dateUS20121341804812.03.2012         Original published format: US201213418048
[2013/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2639481
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2639481
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639481
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16K15/03, F16K27/02
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
Former [2013/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wafer-Prüfventilanordnung und zughörige Verwendungsverfahren[2013/38]
English:Wafer check valve assembly and related methods of use[2013/38]
French:Ensemble de soupape anti-retour de plaquettes et procédés d'utilisation associés[2013/38]
Examination procedure19.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2018Fee for grant paid
16.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.10.2017
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
SM09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
PL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
LV09.05.2018
RS09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI09.05.2018
HR09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
SE09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
NO09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NO09.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4852607  (SCARAMUCCI JOHN P [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-4,8,11-14,16-18;
 [A]WO2011047437  (KIRK LYN [AU]) [A] 1-18 * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 18; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]WO9932816  (AIRVAC INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5713389  (WILSON JR MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005121085  (LEVEY KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *