Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777413

EP2777413 - Method for manufacturing a shoe, shoe and device for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sport Zeisler OHG
Degernpoint R1
85368 Moosburg / DE
[2014/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Zeisler, Albrecht
Bachstraße 2a
84079 Bruckberg / DE
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/44]
Former [2014/38]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date13158694.312.03.2013
[2014/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777413
Date:17.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777413
Date:02.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/04, A43B7/28, A43B5/16, B29D35/00
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schuhs, Schuh sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2014/38]
English:Method for manufacturing a shoe, shoe and device for performing the method[2014/38]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une chaussure, chaussure et dispositif d'exécution du procédé[2014/38]
Examination procedure17.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.06.2016Fee for grant paid
28.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
22.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2016
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
MT02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE12.03.2017
LU12.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/24]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE12.03.2017
LU12.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE12.03.2017
LU12.03.2017
Former [2018/10]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU12.03.2017
Former [2018/01]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/38]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/35]DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO2009046477  (FISCHER SPORTS GMBH [AT], et al) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0842619  (DOLOMITE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2111147  (TESSARO VANIO) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2320407  (PALAU ALFRED) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantDE3714063
 WO8701566
 WO2009046477
 WO2011153567