Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2656736

EP2656736 - A method and apparatus for processing a poultry carcass part [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
[2013/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Van Hillo, Eric Adriaan
c/o Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
02 / Hagendoorn, Jan Willem
c/o Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
03 / Gardenier, Jaco
c/o Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
04 / De Jong, Eric
c/o Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
 [2013/44]
Representative(s)Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V.
Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/44]Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date13158720.612.03.2013
[2013/44]
Priority number, dateNL2012200872927.04.2012         Original published format: NL 2008729
[2013/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2656736
Date:30.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2656736
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A22C21/00
[2013/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/44]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung eines Geflügelschlachtkörperteils[2013/44]
English:A method and apparatus for processing a poultry carcass part[2013/44]
French:Procédé et appareil de traitement d'une partie de carcasse de volaille[2013/44]
Examination procedure07.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/16]
15.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2014Fee for grant paid
19.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.06.2015   
Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
Opponent's representative
EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 [2015/32]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
07.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1368/17
03.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.03.2013
AL01.10.2014
AT01.10.2014
BE01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU12.03.2013
AT01.10.2014
BE01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
SM01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/46]HU12.03.2013
AT01.10.2014
BE01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/39]HU12.03.2013
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE12.03.2015
LU12.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
LU12.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RS01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0369544  (SYSTEMATE BV [NL]) [AD] 1,10 * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 13; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2002155803  (TIELEMAN RUDOLF J [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0036]; figures 1-22 *;
 [A]EP0395169  (LINCO HOLLAND ENG BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 45; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4557015  (DODD THURSTON [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4639975
 EP0369544
 US5176563
 US5188559
 US6322438
 US2005059334