Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639091

EP2639091 - Power split electric all-wheel drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT, NL, SE
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricardo, Inc.
40000 Ricardo Drive
Van Buren Township, MI 48111 / US
[2013/38]
Inventor(s)01 / DeLucia, Thomas Jude
2357 Arcadia Drive
Canton, MI Michigan 48188 / US
02 / Brentnall, Jonathan Philip
127 Stone Bridge Court
Ortonville, MI Michigan 48462 / US
03 / Mepham, Shaun Ewen
867 Arboretum Drive
Saline, MI Michigan 48176 / US
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2013/38]
Application number, filing date13158796.612.03.2013
[2013/38]
Priority number, dateUS201261609608P12.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261609608 P
[2013/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2639091
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639091
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/365, B60K6/48, B60K6/52, B60K6/445, B60K17/354, B60K17/356
[2014/52]
Former International [2013/38]B60K6/52, B60K6/445, B60K17/354, B60K17/356
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2013/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Allradantrieb mit geteilter Leistung[2013/38]
English:Power split electric all-wheel drive[2013/38]
French:Transmission à quatre roues motrices à dérivation de puissance[2013/38]
Examination procedure12.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/17]
03.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.03.2015Fee for grant paid
30.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2014
Opposition(s)09.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/49]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008135838  (FERRARI SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,9,13,14 * figure 1 * * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 27 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 21 * * page 6, line 21 - line 26 * * page 7, line 17 - line 24 * * page 10, line 3 - line 5 * [Y] 2-4,7,10-12,15;
 [Y]US2010138107  (MORRIS ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,10-12 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0025] *;
 [Y]GB2438609  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 3,11 * figure 5 * * page 7, line 13 - line 21 *;
 [Y]EP1544018  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 7,15 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 * * column 4, line 7 - line 10 *;
 [Y]US2012017854  (HOELSCHER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 7,15 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0035] *