EP2636494 - Apparatus for cutting laminate floor panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states wolfcraft GmbH Wolff-Strasse 1 56746 Kempenich / DE | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmer, Jürgen Alte Burgstraße 38 56077 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
Ebert, Winfried Hommersbergstraße 79 56745 Weibern / DE | 03 /
Meid, Theo Römerstraße 29 56745 Weibern / DE | 04 /
Radermacher, Hans Peter Waldstraße 4 56745 Weibern / DE | 05 /
Schlich, Thomas Hauptstraße 5 53534 Hoffeld / DE | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2013/37] | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner Corneliusstraße 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158871.7 | 16.02.2010 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | DE20091003490 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009003490 | [2013/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2636494 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2636494 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2636494 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/30, B26D7/01, B23D17/08 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
B26D1/30 (EP);
B26D7/01 (EP);
E04F21/0076 (EP);
B26D5/02 (EP);
B26D5/10 (EP);
B26D7/00 (EP);
E04F21/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Laminat-Fußbodenplatten | [2013/37] | English: | Apparatus for cutting laminate floor panels | [2013/37] | French: | Dispositif de coupe de plaques de plancher laminées | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10704558.5 / EP2396151 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2010 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR847014 (PARSONS ET AL.) [AD] 1-8 * figure - *; | [X]US2496018 (PEARSON OSCAR H) [X] 13 * column 2, line 37 - line 44; figure - *; | [X]FR60493E (DAVY, J.) [X] 13 * page 2, paragraph 2; figure 5 *; | [XP]EP2098342 (D CUT PRODUCTS INC [US]) [XP] 14* paragraph [0036]; figure 6 * | by applicant | FR575749 | FR612747 | FR847014 |