Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2770325

EP2770325 - Mutations of DEPDC5 for diagnosing epilepsic diseases, disorders or conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.07.2015
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.08.2015  [2015/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut du Cerveau et de la Moelle Épinière-ICM
Hôpital Pitié-Salpêtrière
47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP)
3, avenue Victoria
75001 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6)
4, Place Jussieu
75005 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Institut du Cerveau et de la Moelle Épinière-ICM
Hôpital Pitié-Salpêtrière
47/83, Boulevard de l'Hôpital
75013 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS)
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP)
3, avenue Victoria
75001 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6)
4, Place Jussieu
75005 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Baulac, Stéphanie
340 rue Saint-Jacques
75005 Paris / FR
02 / Leguern, Éric
42 avenue Galliéni
93800 Épinay-sur-Seine / FR
 [2014/35]
Representative(s)Icosa
83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau
75014 Paris / FR
[2014/35]
Application number, filing date13158940.013.03.2013
[2014/35]
Priority number, dateUS201361769345P26.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361769345 P
[2014/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2770325
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, C12Q1/68
[2014/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mutationen von DEPDC5 zur Diagnose von epileptischen Funktionsstörungen, Erkrankungen oder Leiden[2014/35]
English:Mutations of DEPDC5 for diagnosing epilepsic diseases, disorders or conditions[2014/35]
French:Mutations de DEPDC5 pour le diagnostic de maladies, troubles ou états épileptiques[2014/35]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/35]
28.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/35]
10.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2012018258  (UMC UTRECHT HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [T]  ISHIDA SAEKO ET AL, "Mutations of DEPDC5 cause autosomal dominant focal epilepsies.", NATURE GENETICS 26 APR 2013, (20130426), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 1546-1718, pages 552 - 555, XP002696763 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG.2601
 [T]  DIBBENS LEANNE M ET AL, "Mutations in DEPDC5 cause familial focal epilepsy with variable foci.", NATURE GENETICS 26 APR 2013, (20130426), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 1546-1718, pages 546 - 551, XP002696764 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.2599
by applicantWO0250096
 US2010136623
 US7528093
 US2011287418
    HERON ET AL., NAT GENET, (2012), vol. 44, pages 1188 - 90,
    KALACHIKOV ET AL., NAT GENET, (2002), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 335 - 341,
    BERG ET AL., EPILEPSIA, vol. 51, no. 4, pages 676 - 685,
    PICARD, F., BRAIN, (2000), vol. 123, no. 6, pages 1247 - 62,
    PICARD, F. ET AL., BRAIN, (2000), vol. 123, no. 6, pages 1247 - 62,
    THOMAS, P. ET AL., REV NEUROL, (1998), vol. 154, pages 228 - 35,
    SCHEFFER, I.E. ET AL., ANN NEUROL, (1998), vol. 44, pages 890 - 9,
    KLEIN, K.M. ET AL., EPILEPSIA, (2012), vol. 53, pages E151 - 5,
    ISHIKAWA, K. ET AL., DNA RES, (1998), vol. 5, pages 169 - 76,
    DOKUDOVSKAYA, S. ET AL., MOL CELL PROTEOMICS, (2011), vol. 10,
    SENG, T.J. ET AL., GENES CHROMOSOMES CANCER, (2005), vol. 43, pages 181 - 93,
    MIKI, D. ET AL., NAT GENET, (2011), vol. 43, pages 797 - 800,