Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2716509

EP2716509 - Electrical steering column lock for an automative vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U-Shin Deutschland Zugangssysteme GmbH
Waldstrasse 2
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2016/50]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
U-Shin Deutschland Zugangssysteme GmbH
Waldstrasse 2
85253 Erdweg / DE
Former [2014/15]For all designated states
VALEO Sicherheitssysteme GmbH
Waldstrasse 2
85253 Erdweg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Laval, Anthony
Erich Hubmann Str 2B
85221 Dachau / DE
02 / Lehmeier, Norbert
Blücherstrasse 24a
85051 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2014/15]
Representative(s)Gaillarde, Frédéric F. Ch. , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
31-33, rue de la Baume
75008 Paris / FR
[2016/50]
Former [2014/27]Larger, Solène , et al
U-Shin France SAS
Service Propriété Industrielle
2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2014/15]Pothmann, Karsten
Valeo Securité Habitacle
Propriété Industrielle
76 rue Auguste Perret
ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13159066.313.03.2013
[2014/15]
Priority number, dateEP2012018726004.10.2012         Original published format: EP 12187260
EP2012018728404.10.2012         Original published format: EP 12187284
[2014/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2716509
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2716509
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R25/0215
[2014/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2014/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Lenksäulenschloss für ein Automobil[2014/15]
English:Electrical steering column lock for an automative vehicle[2014/15]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage de colonne de direction électrique destiné à un véhicule automobile[2014/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
24.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.11.2016Fee for grant paid
03.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2015
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
03.11.2016Request for further processing filed
03.11.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.11.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.03.2013
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
MT13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
MT13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
IE13.03.2017
LU13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
LU13.03.2017
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE102005027777  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8,10,11 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] * [A] 9;
 [YA]US2010206020  (CHEN PEI-TING [TW], et al) [Y] 1-8,10,11 * figures 7,8 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0043] * [A] 9;
 [A]EP1967424  (VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 8,9 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0029] *
ExaminationEP2767454