Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2639396

EP2639396 - Seal part, and frame assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): RO
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUECK GmbH & Co. KG
Loher Strasse 9
58511 Lüdenscheid / DE
[2014/52]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
EDUARD HUECK GmbH & CO. KG
Loher Strasse 9
58511 Lüdenscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Meister, Wolfgang
Gerichtstr. 3a
58540 Meinerzhagen / DE
02 / Raithel, Carl
Lieselote-Kahn-Str. 3
58513 Lüdenscheid / DE
03 / Volkelt, Thomas
Pleperskamp 2
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
 [2013/49]
Former [2013/38]01 / Meister, Wolfgang
Gerichtstr. 3a
58540 Meinerzhagen / DE
02 / Ralthel, Carl
Lieselote-Kahn-Str. 3
58513 Lüdenscheid / DE
03 / Volkelt, Thomas
Pleperskamp 2
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/50]Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Apothekerstraße 55
59755 Arnsberg / DE
Former [2013/38]Brune, Axel
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
Application number, filing date13159406.115.03.2013
[2013/38]
Priority number, dateDE2012100519616.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012005196
[2013/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2639396
Date:18.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/38]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2639396
Date:04.12.2013
[N/P]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2639396
Date:31.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2639396
Date:13.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:E06B7/14
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
Former [2013/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dichtungsformteil, sowie Rahmenanordnung[2013/38]
English:Seal part, and frame assembly[2013/38]
French:Pièce d'étanchéité et agencement de cadre[2013/38]
Examination procedure15.03.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/14]
16.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2017Fee for grant paid
03.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
[2018/40]
Former [2018/39]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/38]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202010008229U  (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figures 1-4 *;
 [XA]GB2167099  (PLANET WINDOWS) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 76 - page 4, line 27; figure 1 * [A] 7-14