Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2781973

EP2781973 - System for attaching a bracelet strand to a case [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse
Schild-Rust-Strasse 17
2540 Grenchen / CH
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Bettelini, Marco
Chemin des Saigneules 17a
2515 Prêles / CH
02 / Grünig, Daniel
Route du Pavy 11
1786 Sugiez / CH
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Gilligmann, Benoît Philippe , et al
ICB
Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA
Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2014/39]
Application number, filing date13159929.219.03.2013
[2014/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2781973
Date:24.09.2014
Language:FR
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2781973
Date:06.01.2016
Language:FR
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G04B37/14
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Befestigungssystem eines Armbandabschnitts an einem Gehäuse[2014/39]
English:System for attaching a bracelet strand to a case[2014/39]
French:Système d'attache d'un brin de bracelet à un boîtier[2014/39]
Examination procedure05.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/39]
23.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2015Fee for grant paid
03.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.03.2013
AL06.01.2016
AT06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
TR06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU19.03.2013
AT06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
TR06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU19.03.2013
AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE19.03.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/47]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
LU19.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL06.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]EP0945083  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,10,11 [Y] 3 [I] 6,7;
 [XA]US4432654  (HESSELSCHWERDT BERNHARD [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document * [A] 3-7,9-11;
 [Y]EP1104894  (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH]) [Y] 3 * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]WO2013076220  (HUBLOT S A GENEVE [CH]) [E] 1,8,9,11 * figures 1-6 *;
 [XY]CH179155  (LAPP FERDINAND [DE]) [X] 11 * figures 6-11 * [Y] 3
by applicantEP0246449