Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2634793

EP2634793 - Mass spectrometer with improved mass accuracy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thermo Finnigan LLC
355 River Oaks Parkway
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
[2013/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Schoen, Alan E.
16810 Bohlman Road
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
02 / Heller, Rexford T.
421 Camille Circle 16
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
03 / Schweingruber, Hans
2161 Creeden Way
Mountain, View, CA 94040 / US
 [2013/36]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/36]Frost, Alex John , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13160230.202.06.2003
[2013/36]
Priority number, dateUS20020384742P31.05.2002         Original published format: US 384742 P
[2013/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2634793
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2634793
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/00, H01J49/28, H01J49/42, H05K1/02
[2013/49]
Former International [2013/36]H01J49/00, H01J49/28, H01J49/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/36]
TitleGerman:Massenspektrometer mit verbesserter Massegenauigkeit[2013/36]
English:Mass spectrometer with improved mass accuracy[2013/36]
French:Spectromètre de masse avec une meilleure précision de masse[2013/36]
Examination procedure27.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/16]
06.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03731502.5  / EP1509943
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030731502) is  18.03.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
20.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]US4709148  (MEDDINGS BASIL [CA]) [I] 1-8 * column 1, line 25 - line 53 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 10 * * figures 1,1A *;
 [A]US6208213  (ANASTASYEV SERGEJ VLADIMIROVIC [RU], et al) [A] 4-8 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 22 *;
 [A]US5180942  (MARVIN DENNIS F [US], et al) [A] 4-8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 6 *;
 [A]US6362700  (FRY STEVEN J [US]) [A] 4-8 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 21 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5935466  (KNUDSEN NIELS [US]) [A] 4-8 * column 1, line 40 - line 67 *;
 [A]US5488368  (BROWN ERIC W [US], et al) [A] 4-8 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 5 *;
 [A]US6108205  (BERGSTEDT LEIF R [SE]) [A] 4-8 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 7 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3550006  (HARNER ROBERT H) [A] 4-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB878053  (AMPHENOL BORG ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 4-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4234791