Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782256

EP2782256 - A digital to analogue converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohm Co., Ltd.
21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP
[2014/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Mladenova, Irina
Rohm Co., Ltd.
21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho
Ukyo-ku, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP
 [2014/39]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2018/24]
Former [2014/39]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date13160547.922.03.2013
[2014/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782256
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782256
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/06, // H03M1/68, H03K17/06
[2014/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Digital-Analog-Umsetzer[2014/39]
English:A digital to analogue converter[2014/39]
French:Convertisseur numérique-analogique[2014/39]
Examination procedure19.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
30.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2018Fee for grant paid
02.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.01.2018
Opposition(s)14.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
IT13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
NO13.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2001038351  (BRUNOLLI MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * figures 2,5 * * paragraph [0049] *;
 [Y]US5767733  (GRUGETT BRUCE C [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,9,10,12 * column 3, lines 41-58 * * figures 4-6 *
by applicantUS5495245