Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784180

EP2784180 - Method for activating a copper surface for electroless plating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kilian, Arnd, Dr.
Wilhelmstraße 48
10117 Berlin / DE
02 / Wegricht, Jens
Berliner Allee 90
13088 Berlin / DE
03 / Lautan, Donny
Karl-Heinrich-Ulrichs-Straße 2
10787 Berlin / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13160785.525.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784180
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784180
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:C23C18/18, H01L21/288, H05K3/24
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Aktivierung einer Kupferoberfläche zur elektrofreien Plattierung[2014/40]
English:Method for activating a copper surface for electroless plating[2014/40]
French:Procédé d'activation d'une surface de cuivre pour dépôt anélectrolytique[2014/40]
Examination procedure09.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
03.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2015Fee for grant paid
26.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2013
AL30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU25.03.2013
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.03.2013
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU25.03.2013
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/47]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/16]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/07]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE25.03.2016
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/03]BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/47]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU25.03.2016
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2008184679  (OKUNO CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] * * table 1 *;
 [A]JP2007177268  (OKUNO CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * tables 1, 2 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [A]US4066517  (STEVENS PETER ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 18 * * example 3 *;
 [AD]US7285492  (WANG XINMING [JP] ET AL) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * sentence 19, paragraph 4 - sentence 30 * * examples 1,2 *