Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783834

EP2783834 - Polymer or polymer network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität Dortmund
August-Schmidt-Str. 4
44227 Dortmund / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Tiller, Jörg Christian
Bahnhofstraße 16
58313 Herdecke / DE
02 / Quitmann, Dominik
Amalienstraße 26
44137 Dortmund / DE
03 / Katzenberg, Frank
Krautstraße 69
59425 Unna / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Michalski, Stefan
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Patentanwälte
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date13160849.925.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783834
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C61/06
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Polymer oder Polymernetzwerk[2014/40]
English:Polymer or polymer network[2014/40]
French:Polymère ou réseau de polymères[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
04.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
22.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011003832  (UNIV DORTMUND TECH [DE]; TILLER JOERG CHRISTIAN [DE]; KATZENBERG FRANK) [X] 1-15 * page 3 - page 5; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2010218716  (HAVENS DAVID ERNEST [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * page 2, paragraph 19 * * page 3, paragraphs 33-40 * * page 4, paragraphs 57-58; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US2012213969  (MATHER PATRICK [US] ET AL) [A] 1,15 * page 2; figure -; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2011217547  (MATHER PATRICK [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * page 5, paragraph 65 - page 6, paragraph 72; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2012180802  (WARE TAYLOR [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 14 * * page 3, paragraphs 35-36; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US4921323  (DELAHANTY FRANCIS T [US] ET AL) [A] 1,15 * column 2, lines 26-68; claim - *;
 [A]US6783530  (LEVY MARK [IL]) [A] 1,15 * column 5, lines 48-63 *;
 [A]US2005033295  (WISNEWSKI PAUL [US]) [A] 1,15 * page 6, paragraphs 56-59 *;
 [X]WO2009095434  (GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE]; KRATZ KARL [DE]; LENDLEIN ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,15 * page 3; example -; claim - *;
 [X]US2011039967  (WILSON THOMAS S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,15 * page 2, paragraph 23 * * page 3, paragraphs 42,43; example -; claim - *
 [X]  - LI J; RODGERS W R; XIE T, "Semi-crystalline two-way shape memory elastomer", POLYMER, (20111027), vol. 52, no. 23, pages 5320 - 5325, XP002711405 [X] 1,15 * page 5321 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2011.09.030
 [A]  - AHMAD M; LUO J; MIRAFTAB M, "Feasibility study of polyurethane shape-memory polymer actuators for pressure bandage application", SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20120202), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 1 - 7, XP002711406 [A] 1,5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1468-6996/13/1/015006
 [A]  - DEBDATTA RATNA ET AL, "Recent advances in shape memory polymers and composites: a review", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20071017), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 1573-4803, pages 254 - 269, XP019553064 [A] 1,15 * page 258 - page 261 * * page 264 *
 [X]  - JINSONG LENG ET AL, "Shape-memory polymers and their composites: Stimulus methods and applications", PROGRESS IN MATERIALS SCIENCE, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 56, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.PMATSCI.2011.03.001, ISSN 0079-6425, (20110211), pages 1077 - 1135, (20110316), XP028095959 [X] 1,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pmatsci.2011.03.001