Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784188

EP2784188 - Process for corrosion protection of iron containing materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Dingwerth, Dr. Björn
Von-Luck-Straße 2A
14129 Berlin / DE
02 / Krüger, Mike
Wilhelm-Leuschner Straße 26
64347 Griesheim / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2018/17]
Former [2014/40]Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20
10553 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13161011.526.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784188
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784188
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2784188
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C25D3/56, C25D5/10, C25D5/48, // C25D5/14
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Korrosionsschutz von eisenhaltigen Materialien[2014/40]
English:Process for corrosion protection of iron containing materials[2014/40]
French:Procédé de protection contre la corrosion de matériaux contenant du fer[2014/40]
Examination procedure19.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
07.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2015Fee for grant paid
13.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2016   
Hillebrand Chemicals GmbH
Westerhaar 29
58739 Wickede (Ruhr) / DE
Opponent's representative
Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  05.02.2016   
Dr.Ing. Max Schlötter GmbH & Co. KG
Talgraben 30
73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2016/11]
18.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.04.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.07.2017
21.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
02.05.2017Reply to a communication from the opposition division
05.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
31.08.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.09.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.03.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2013
AL06.05.2015
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU26.03.2013
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU26.03.2013
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU26.03.2013
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE26.03.2016
LU26.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU26.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU26.03.2016
Former [2016/37]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2294949  (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1,2,8-13 *;
 [A]EP1536037  (SANOH IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] *;
 [A]GB2178760  (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP]) [A] 14 * page 1, lines 95-124; figure 1 * * page 1, line 125 - page 2, line 28; example 1 *;
 [A]DE102010026046  (GALVANOTECHNIK BAUM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0015] - [0018] *
by applicantUS2005189231
 US2010133113
 US2010180793
 US6478886
OppositionEP0453374
 DE19837431
 DE102005025830
 DE102009045569
 EP1970470
 EP2014793
 WO9951793
    - SLOTOLOY ZN 60, (19990000), XP055276861
    - SLOTOPAS ZN 60 schwarz, (20040000), XP055276862
    - SLOTOFIN 10
    - "Betriebsanweisung", SLOTOLOY ZN 60
    - "Betriebsanweisung", SLOTOPAS ZN, (20041026), vol. 60
    - WOMag: Kompetenz in Werkstoff und funktioneller Oberfläche; WOTech GbR - Technical Media (E-ISSN: 2195-5905
    - Präambel von SLOTOLOY ZN 6 0
    - Präambel von SLOTOPAS ZN 60 schwarz
    - Präambel von SLOTOFIN 10