Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2645622

EP2645622 - Image processing apparatus and image processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2013/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kemmochi, Eiji
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP
 [2013/40]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/51]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Former [2013/40]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date13161059.426.03.2013
[2013/40]
Priority number, dateJP2012008224230.03.2012         Original published format: JP 2012082242
[2013/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2645622
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2645622
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, // H04L12/58
[2013/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/40]
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Bildverarbeitungssystem[2013/40]
English:Image processing apparatus and image processing system[2013/40]
French:Système de traitement d'images et appareil de traitement d'images[2017/51]
Former [2013/40]Système de traitement dýimages et appareil de traitement dýimages
Examination procedure26.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
22.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.07.2017Fee for grant paid
25.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2017
Opposition(s)21.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SI20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IE26.03.2018
LU26.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IE26.03.2018
LU26.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2019/04]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
LU26.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
DK20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RO20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
IT20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT20.12.2017
CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY20.12.2017
CZ20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
ES20.12.2017
FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
PL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
SK20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
NL20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI20.12.2017
HR20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SE20.12.2017
BG20.03.2018
NO20.03.2018
GR21.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
NO20.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010241432  (MICHAELIS PAUL ROLLER [US]) [X] 1,6,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 73 * [Y] 2-5,7,8;
 [XY]WO2011145539  (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,9 * page 1, line 10 - page 6, line 14 * * page 8, line 1 - page 32, line 5 * [Y] 2-5,7,8;
 [A]EP2023630  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 122 *
by applicantJP2011199450
 JP4627781B