Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783770

EP2783770 - Device and method for handling sheet metal parts on a machine tool for cutting sheet metal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Liere, Max
Holunderweg 5
71254 Ditzingen / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/38]Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/40]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13161215.227.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783770
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783770
Date:16.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B21D43/10, B25J9/00, B25J9/16
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Handhaben von Blechteilen an einer Werkzeugmaschine zum schneidenden Bearbeiten von Blechen[2014/40]
English:Device and method for handling sheet metal parts on a machine tool for cutting sheet metal[2014/40]
French:Dispositif et procédé de manipulation de pièces en tôle sur une machine-outil destinée au traitement de découpe de tôles[2014/40]
Examination procedure04.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
31.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2015Fee for grant paid
28.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2013
AL16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU27.03.2013
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2018/32]HU27.03.2013
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU27.03.2013
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU27.03.2013
CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
FR31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
IE27.03.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
LU27.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ16.09.2015
DK16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/37]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES16.09.2015
FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NL16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SE16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT16.09.2015
NO16.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT16.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2009146716  (TRUMPF SACHSEN GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1,13,15 * abstract *
by applicantWO2009146716