Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784557 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784557



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 94
27.03.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
27.03.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
27.03.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.03.2013 Description Search / examination 31
27.03.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
27.03.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.03.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
17.10.2013 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
24.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
24.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
24.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
01.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
01.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
01.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.10.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
27.01.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
08.02.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1