blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784557


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
26.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
11.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
10.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
01.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]