blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784557
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9651746Global Dossier 16.05.2017B2
US2016011385 14.01.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514859500 21.09.2015
EP13161425 27.03.2013
WO2014US31669 25.03.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014160676Global Dossier 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13161425 27.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2784557Global Dossier 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13161425 27.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201439632 16.10.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13161425 27.03.2013