Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784557

EP2784557 - Optoelectronic device and method for assembling an optoelectronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CCS Technology, Inc.
103 Foulk Road
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Kossat, Rainer
Hainbach 34
83229 Aschau / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13161425.727.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784557
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optoelektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Montage einer optoelektronischen Vorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Optoelectronic device and method for assembling an optoelectronic device[2014/40]
French:Dispositif optoélectronique et procédé d'assemblage d'un tel dispositif[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
27.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003012522  (JOHNSON GLEN WALDEN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0044] * * figures 3,5,8-13 *;
 [A]EP2523029  (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-16 *