Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784790

EP2784790 - Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.09.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.10.2015  [2015/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Tonin, Andrea
Via G. Garibaldi, 23
36070 Brogliano (VI) / IT
02 / Carollo, Carlo
Via San Benedetto, 13
36016 Thiene (VI) / IT
03 / Ramponi, Emanuele
Via Tito Livio 15/3
36071 Arzignano (VI) / IT
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)De Santis, Giovanni
ABB S.p.A. Via L. Lama, 33
20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13161665.828.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784790
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/14, H01F27/40
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Druckentlastungsvorrichtung für einen Stromtransformator und zugehöriger Stromtransformator[2014/40]
English:Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer[2014/40]
French:Dispositif de libération de pression pour transformateur de puissance et transformateur de puissance associé[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/43]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/43]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN202420748U  (TIANWEI YUNNAN TRANSFORMER CO LTD) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8;
 [XI]CN2805038Y  (YANG HAIQUN [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8;
 [XI]CN201973308U  (CHINA XD ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8;
 [XI]CN201215201Y  (SHENYANG STI ELECTRICAL SCIENC [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 1-3 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8;
 [XI]CN2636020Y  (XINJIANG TEBIAN ELECTRIC CO LT [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 2,3 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8;
 [A]EP2520836  (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *