Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783837

EP2783837 - Method and apparatus for the layered construction of a moulded part [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ivoclar Vivadent AG
Bendererstrasse 2
9494 Schaan / LI
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Laubersheimer, Jürgen
Moos 4
9470 Buchs / CH
02 / Schmid, David
Wingertsplona 1
7204 Untervaz / CH
 [2016/41]
Former [2014/40]01 / Lauberheimer, Jürgen
Moos 4
9470 Buchs / CH
02 / Schmid, David
Wingertsplona 1
7204 Bern / CH
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2014/40]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date13161676.528.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783837
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783837
Date:12.10.2016
Language:DE
[2016/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00, B41J2/045, B41J2/165
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum schichtweisen Aufbau eines Formkörpers[2014/40]
English:Method and apparatus for the layered construction of a moulded part[2014/40]
French:Procédé et dispositif destinés au montage en couches d'un corps de formage[2014/40]
Examination procedure27.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
19.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2016Fee for grant paid
05.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2016
Opposition(s)13.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2013
CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MT12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
MT12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
Former [2018/24]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2017/52]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
MC12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SI12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/38]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
BG12.01.2017
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/37]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
SM12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
EE12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RO12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
SK12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ12.10.2016
DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/33]DK12.10.2016
ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/26]ES12.10.2016
FI12.10.2016
HR12.10.2016
LT12.10.2016
LV12.10.2016
NL12.10.2016
PL12.10.2016
RS12.10.2016
SE12.10.2016
NO12.01.2017
GR13.01.2017
IS12.02.2017
PT13.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV12.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006061618  (HERNANDEZ ANDRES T [US] ET AL HERNANDEZ ANDRES TOMAS [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0116] * * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0988977  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102009055966  (VOXELJET TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0104] * * claim - *;
 [Y]EP0911171  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] *;
 [A]WO2011135496  (OBJET GEOMETRIES LTD [IL]; DIKOVSKY DANIEL [IL]; LEVY AVRAHAM [IL]; NA) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1095776  (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US] EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2233449