Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783691

EP2783691 - Polysialic acid and use for treatment of neurodegenerative and neuroinflammatory diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.09.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinische Friedrich-Wilhelms-Universität Bonn
Regina-Pacis-Weg 3
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
Universität zu Köln
Albertus-Magnus-Platz
50923 Köln / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Neumann, Harald
Johann-Bieser-Str. 23
53123 Bonn / DE
02 / Kopatz, Jens
Pfarrer-Martini-Str. 41
53121 Bonn / DE
03 / Shahraz, Anahita
Kessenicher Str. 7
53129 Bonn / DE
04 / Karlstetter, Marcus
Türnicher Str. 18
50969 Köln / DE
05 / Langmann, Thomas
Sperlingsweg 21
50226 Frechen / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13161689.828.03.2013
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783691
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/715
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Polysialinsäuren und Verwendung zur Behandlung neurodegenerativer und neuroinflammatorischer Erkrankungen[2014/40]
English:Polysialic acid and use for treatment of neurodegenerative and neuroinflammatory diseases[2014/40]
French:Acide polysialique et utilisation pour le traitement des troubles neurodégénératifs et de maladies neuro-inflammatoires[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/41]
12.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP0502550  (KANTO ISHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,12-14 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 54; examples 1-8; claims 1-12 * * page 2, line 14 * [Y] 7-11,15;
 [A]US6395717  (OHTA MICHIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 10-15 *;
 [X]  - H J JENNINGS ET AL, "Determinant specificities of the groups B and C polysaccharides of Neisseria meningitidis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19850401), vol. 134, no. 4, pages 2651 - 2657, XP055065135 [X] 1-3,5,12-14 * page 2652, column right, lines 9-37; figures 1,6,7 *
 [X]  - JUKKA HÄYRINEN ET AL, "High affinity binding of long-chain polysialic acid to antibody, and modulation by divalent cations and polyamines", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (20021101), vol. 39, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/S0161-5890(02)00202-X, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 399 - 411, XP055065292 [X] 1-3,5,12-14 * paragraph "2. Materials and methods" on pages 400-402;; tables 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(02)00202-X
 [X]  - EVANS S V ET AL, "Evidence for the extended helical nature of polysaccharide epitopes. The 2.8 A resolution structure and thermodynamics of ligand binding of an antigen binding fragment specific for alpha-(2 fwdarw 8)-polysialic acid", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19950101), vol. 34, no. 20, doi:10.1021/BI00020A019, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 6737 - 6744, XP002630230 [X] 1-3 * paragraph "Preparation of Oligomers of Sialic Acid"; page 6738; table 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00020a019
 [X]  - YASUSHI SHIMODA ET AL, "Calcium Ion Binding of Three Different Types of Oligo/Polysialic Acids As Studied by Equilibrium Dialysis and Circular Dichroic Methods", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19940201), vol. 33, no. 5, doi:10.1021/bi00171a020, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 1202 - 1208, XP055065164 [X] 1-3 * table 1; compounds H-CA, M-CA *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00171a020
 [Y]  - Y. WANG ET AL, "Alleviation of Neurotoxicity by Microglial Human Siglec-11", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20100303), vol. 30, no. 9, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3940-09.2010, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 3482 - 3488, XP055078114 [Y] 7-11,15 * page 3482, column right, paragraphs 1-23 * * paragraph "Neuroprot4ective effect of Siglec-11in neuron-microglia coculture"; page 3486, column right, line 1 - page 3487, column left, line 5; figure 4 * * page 3487, column left, paragraph last - page 3487, column right, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.3940-09.2010
by applicantUS2009010944
 WO2010125110